+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 233199/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
233199/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 16-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 16-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 18-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 18-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 22-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 22-2705 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 24-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 24-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 25-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 25-2705 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 27-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 27-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 31-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 31-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 9-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 9-2704 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 11, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor