+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 603693/1 Report Adopted
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
603693/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 13, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor