+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-3)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {414964/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
414964/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 3
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor