+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {623227/2 Adopted
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/3 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {396180/1 Report Adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-217 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 8, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor