+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Adopted
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Failure to Possess or Display
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-112, 16-112.1 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 27, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 24, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
January 9, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor