+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-804 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 13, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor