+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (31-15)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (85-50)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Laid Over (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs)
- Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Laid Over (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan)
- Favorable with Amendments {714968/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-208 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (7)
March 24, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 15
March 12, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 50
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 87
March 8, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 87
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor