+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-42)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 11, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 42
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor