+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 653591/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
653591/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 8, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137