+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (84-52)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {773921/1 Rejected (52-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Adams) {553327/1 Rejected (53-83)
- Floor Amendment (Washington County Delegation) {136913/1 Rejected (52-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {553624/1 Rejected (51-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Arentz) {353424/2 Rejected (50-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {713327/1 Rejected (50-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {463129/1 Rejected (39-91)
- Floor Amendment (Cecil County) {706112/1 Rejected (50-81)
- Floor Amendment (Ciliberti02) {383624/1 Rejected (51-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Saab) {383928/1 Rejected (50-82)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Otto) {433229/1 Rejected (47-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {683124/1 Rejected (51-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {883626/1 Rejected (51-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {413925/1 Rejected (49-82)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {733625/1 Rejected (49-82)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {414668/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate A. Miller) {443426/1 Adopted
- Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
- Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (17)
773921/01
Rejected
883626/01
Rejected
733625/01
Rejected
713327/01
Rejected
683124/01
Rejected
706112/01
Rejected
553624/01
Rejected
463129/01
Rejected
553327/01
Rejected
433229/01
Rejected
413925/01
Rejected
383624/01
Rejected
383928/01
Rejected
136913/01
Rejected
353424/02
Rejected
443426/01
Adopted
414668/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 16-403 - Article - Education
- 16-412 - Article - Education
- 16-414.1 - Article - Education
- 3-2A-01 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-2A-05 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-2A-07 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-2A-08 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-101 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-102 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-403 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-501 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-502 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 3-601 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (17)
March 4, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 52
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Adams) {553327/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 83
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Arentz) {353424/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 84
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {413925/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 82
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {733625/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 82
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cecil County) {706112/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 81
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ciliberti) {383624/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 81
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {713327/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 81
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {683124/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 81
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Morgan) {463129/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 91
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (M. Washington County Delegation) {136913/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 84
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {883626/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 83
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Otto) {433229/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 84
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Saab) {383928/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 82
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (W. Miller) {553624/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 83
March 2, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {773921/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 84
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor