+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (121-11)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
- Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 18, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-106 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2021: Third Reading Passed (121-11)
- Yeas: 121
- Nays: 11
February 16, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
December 23, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor