+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor