+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {184168/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
184168/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 12, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor