+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-105.2 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
February 13, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor