+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn by Sponsor
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing canceled
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland
- First Reading Appropriations
On August 31, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-101, 12-101.1, 14-501 through 14-513, 14-601 through 14-613, 14-701 through 14-713 - Article - Education
+ − Vote
February 16, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor