+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {882716/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
882716/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-926 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 30, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor