+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Real Property Records Improvement Fund and Nonbudgeted State Agencies
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Real Property Records Improvement Fund and Nonbudgeted State Agencies
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Floor Amendment {193326/1 (Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Text - First - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
- Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
On August 4, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 3A-313 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Yeas: 138
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
February 5, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
January 4, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor