+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {603093/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
603093/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-704 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
February 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 9, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor