+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {783594/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
783594/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 12, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor