+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (121-0)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {753525/1 Adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-909 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (121-0)
- Yeas: 121
February 21, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
January 25, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor