+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Election Law - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {613929/1 Adopted
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Election Law - Voting Order Priority - Individuals Who Need Extra Assistance
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-206, 10-306, 10-309.1 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
December 22, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor