+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Open Meetings Act - Notices and Closed Sessions - Retention Periods and Online Posting
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Open Meetings Act - Notices and Closed Sessions - Retention Periods and Online Posting
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments Adopted
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {823229/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Open Meetings Act – Notices, Closed Sessions, and Minutes – Retention Periods, Online Posting, and Public Inspection
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {673929/1 Adopted
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
- Text - First - Open Meetings Act – Notices, Closed Sessions, and Minutes – Retention Periods, Online Posting, and Public Inspection
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-302, 3-305 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 14, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
January 13, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor