+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Passed Enrolled
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments 154835/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 375266/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
February 11, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor