+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-4)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (109-21)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 4
February 27, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 21
February 24, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor