+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor