+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 4/12 at 6:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 4/12 at 6:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 4/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (112-20)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
- Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
On October 9, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-102, 7-103 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (112-20)
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 20
February 5, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
December 23, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor