+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (116-7)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {733525/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-4)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {963120/1 Adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Cybersecurity Scholarship Program – Alterations and Maryland Cybersecurity Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Establishment
- First Reading Appropriations
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On September 16, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-3501, 18-3502, 18-3503, 18-3504, 18-3505, 18-3506 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (116-7)
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 7
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-4)
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 4
February 21, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
January 5, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor