+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (118-21)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {542812/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
542812/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-104 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 21
February 22, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor