+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 5, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 2, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor