+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (97-33)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - School Discipline - Data Collection
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {793524/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - School Discipline - Data Collection and School Resource Officers
- First Reading Ways and Means
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-1508, 7-306 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2022: Third Reading Passed (97-33)
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 33
January 5, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor