+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-25)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {613498/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
613498/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-701 through 11-710 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 12, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 25