+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {548174/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {112414/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 6, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46