+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
- Text - Chapter - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (98-41)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (34-11)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {794337/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (95-39)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Value My Vote Act
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {733327/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-85)
- Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {705061/1 Adopted
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Value My Vote Act
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
On November 1, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 2-501 - Article - Correctional Services
- 1-303.1, 3-102 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (8)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (98-41)
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 41
April 10, 2021: Third Reading Passed (34-11)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 11
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (95-39)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 39
March 20, 2021: Floor Amendment {733327/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-85)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 85
March 19, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
December 22, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
December 22, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor