+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 784469/1 Report Adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
784469/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 28, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 1, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
February 26, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor