+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 470218/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
470218/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor