+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-4)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {106085/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
106085/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 4
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor