+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {552010/1 Report Adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
552010/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-207 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 20, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor