+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (100-36)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Feldman, Reilly, and Klausmeier
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann, and Kramer
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {757571/1 Report Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-49)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
757571/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 36
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 27, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
February 13, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor