+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (99-38)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {813323/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {104534/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (97-38)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected (44-94)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected (45-94)
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {570015/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 38
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 12
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 94
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 94
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor