+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 10, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
February 7, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor