+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (127-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {824937/1 Report Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {983095/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 12-113 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 2-206 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 5-201 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 5-401 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 6-201 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 7-101 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 8-202 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 8-202.2 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 8-203 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 8-210 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 8-212 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 9-204.1 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
March 27, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor