+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 430117/1 Report Adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
430117/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-202.1 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 1, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 26, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor