+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-2)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {223992/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-203 - Article - Corporations and Associations
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-2)
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor