+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (100-36)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-16)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments 827178/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (117-21)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 594964/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 16
March 25, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 36
February 11, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor