+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-1)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-3)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-410 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 3
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor