+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {273025/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {295260/1 Report Adopted
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 21, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 16, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor