+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (41-5)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-37)
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 960513/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
960513/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 5
March 16, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 37
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor