+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-48)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {393994/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
393994/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 10, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 48
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor