+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {293395/1 Report Adopted
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
293395/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-12B-02 - Article - Commercial Law
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
February 21, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
February 18, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor