+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {838472/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
838472/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-118 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor